This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 06:48:22 (UTC).

SAMANTHA SILVER VS ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 SAMANTHA SILVER filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2478

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVER SAMANTHA

Defendants

DOE ADRIAN

ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAKHBAZYAN ELINA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/11/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/11/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/11/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2024
  • Hearing07/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SAMANTHA SILVER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SAMANTHA SILVER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SAMANTHA SILVER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAKHBAZYAN ELINA