This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 08:09:48 (UTC).

SAMANTHA RAE ZARAGOZA, ET AL. VS AMBER LEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 SAMANTHA RAE ZARAGOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMBER LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1340

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZARAGOZA SAMANTHA RAE

ZARAGOZA BRENDA MICHELLE

Defendants

LEE AMBER

GIBSON PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLICKMAN STEVEN C

MERRITT BRENT STEPHEN

Defendant Attorney

SCHUBERT SALLY L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/9/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Demand for Jury Trial

5/7/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Association of Attorney

5/3/2021: Association of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

4/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/24/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2024
  • Hearing03/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Samantha Rae Zaragoza (Plaintiff); Brenda Michelle Zaragoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Amber Lee (Defendant); Patricia Gibson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Amber Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Amber Lee (Defendant); Patricia Gibson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Samantha Rae Zaragoza (Plaintiff); Brenda Michelle Zaragoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Samantha Rae Zaragoza (Plaintiff); Brenda Michelle Zaragoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Samantha Rae Zaragoza (Plaintiff); Brenda Michelle Zaragoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Samantha Rae Zaragoza (Plaintiff); Brenda Michelle Zaragoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Samantha Rae Zaragoza (Plaintiff); Brenda Michelle Zaragoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Samantha Rae Zaragoza (Plaintiff); Brenda Michelle Zaragoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHUBERT SALLY LEE