This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 07:20:05 (UTC).

SAMANTHA BORREGO VS JOSEF STORZI

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 SAMANTHA BORREGO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSEF STORZI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3714

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BORREGO SAMANTHA

Defendant

STORZI JOSEF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAKIM GEORGE ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BAHARVAR GABRIELLA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

5/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

5/21/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/21/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2024
  • Hearing04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by JOSEF STORZI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JOSEF STORZI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JOSEF STORZI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SAMANTHA BORREGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SAMANTHA BORREGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SAMANTHA BORREGO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAHARVAR GABRIELLA