This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 07:40:28 (UTC).

SAM S JUNG ET AL VS JOON W KIM ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 SAM S JUNG filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against JOON W KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7833

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

JUNG SARAH

JUNG SAM S.

WOO SARAH

Defendants

C4 CAPITAL PARTNERS LP

KIM JOON W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SUEN JAY

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

FIRDT AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY FOR FAILURE TO MAKE FINANCIAL INFORMATION AVAILABLE UNJUST ENRICHMENT CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD AND FRAUD

3/23/2018: FIRDT AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY FOR FAILURE TO MAKE FINANCIAL INFORMATION AVAILABLE UNJUST ENRICHMENT CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD AND FRAUD

Unknown

3/28/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

4/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

Minute Order

4/12/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/14/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

5/14/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

6/14/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585(D)

7/10/2018: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585(D)

DECLARATION OF JAY SUEN REGARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

7/10/2018: DECLARATION OF JAY SUEN REGARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDECD COMPLAINT

7/10/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDECD COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/17/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

AMENDD PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/30/2018: AMENDD PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sam S. Jung (Plaintiff); Sarah Woo (Legacy Party); Sarah Jung (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Sam S. Jung (Plaintiff); Sarah Woo (Legacy Party); Sarah Jung (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Sam S. Jung (Plaintiff); Sarah Woo (Legacy Party); Sarah Jung (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sam S. Jung (Plaintiff); Sarah Woo (Legacy Party); Sarah Jung (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sam S. Jung (Plaintiff); Sarah Woo (Legacy Party); Sarah Jung (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT. FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY 2. FAILURE TO MAKE FINANCIAL INFORMATION AVAILABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sam S. Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

YOUNGMAN ERICSSON-SCOTT, LLP

1981 N. BROADWAY, SUITE 300 WALNUT CREEK, CA .94586

NN'NNNNNNH_M»HHH-H'HHHH

qo\m&uuwc\oooqc\ma;.wmfi—o

Jay Suen (SBN 264190) Rachel H. Rosenfeld (SBN 297064) YOUNGMAN ERICSSON:SCOTT, LLP:

1981 N. Broadway, Suite 300 F||_ED Walnut Creek, California’ 94596 Superior Court of California (925) 930-6000 RSty of Los Angeles 925) 934-5377 fax '

(925) 9 DEC 20 2017

?X&mg y?l[l}gcl}) taintiffs Sherr secutiye Officar/Clerk SARAH WOO a/k/a SARAH JUNG By T Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF.LOS ANGELES

SAM S. JUNG; individually, and:SARAH) ~Case.No. BC68 78 g3 WOO a/k/a SARAH JUNG; individually’ )

COMPLAINT .FOR:

| 1. -Breach of Fiduciary Duty: JOON W. KIM; md1v1dually and, as ‘the.) 2. Failire to Make Financial general partner - of C4 CAPITAL)) Information Available PARTNER, ‘LP: €4 CAPITAL)

.PARTNERS LP a Cahforma limited: ) partnershxp, and DOES 1 through 50 f inclusive;

.*v“

) Plaintiffs, )g ) )

V) D,

GENERAL ALLEGATIONS

I, Plaintiff JUNG is-an adult, and i, at all times herein, a resident of Orange County,

California.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUEN, JAY