This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2023 at 05:12:03 (UTC).

SAM S. CHHAY, ET AL. VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2023 SAM S CHHAY, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4683

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHHAY SAM S.

KETH KATHERINE

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCGEE WILLIAM R ESQ.

WALLACE-TRACY DEANNA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ARENS MCBRIDE MARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/3/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/3/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/3/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/3/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/6/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

6/7/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

8/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Request for Dismissal

8/7/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference OR Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal of Settled Case scheduled for 10/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sam S. Chhay, et al. on 03/03/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sam S. Chhay and Katherine Keth as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Sam S. Chhay (Plaintiff); Katherine Keth (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference OR Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal of Settled Case scheduled for 10/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 08/01/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant); As to: Katherine Keth (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sam S. Chhay (Plaintiff); Katherine Keth (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Deanna Wallace-Tracy, Esq. (Attorney): Last Name changed from Wallace to Wallace-Tracy; Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAddress for Deanna Wallace-Tracy, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sam S. Chhay (Plaintiff); Katherine Keth (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sam S. Chhay (Plaintiff); Katherine Keth (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less