This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 06:58:46 (UTC).

SAM GILANI, ET AL. VS FRANCO SANTIAGO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 SAM GILANI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANCO SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6437

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GILANI LILY

GILANI SAM

Defendants

SANTIAGO FRANCO

KEIICHI MICHAEL PERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS LAWRENCE D.

Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON EDGOR G. III

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR STEFFAN

3/2/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR STEFFAN

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/10/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Declaration re: Due Diligence

3/10/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/8/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/22/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Demand for Jury Trial

4/21/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/21/2021: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2024
  • Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Hearing08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by SAM GILANI (Plaintiff); STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by FRANCO SANTIAGO (Defendant); MICHAEL PERRY KEIICHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FRANCO SANTIAGO (Defendant); MICHAEL PERRY KEIICHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SAM GILANI (Plaintiff); STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by SAM GILANI (Plaintiff); STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by SAM GILANI (Plaintiff); STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SAM GILANI (Plaintiff); STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Steffan); Filed by STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SAM GILANI (Plaintiff); STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SAM GILANI (Plaintiff); STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SAM GILANI (Plaintiff); STEFFAN GILANI (Plaintiff); LILY GILANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6437 Hearing Date: March 22, 2022 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

The Court excuses the personal appearance of the claimant and the guardian ad litem. Counsel may appear by telephone or video conference call.

The Court has reviewed the Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor (Steffan Gilani, age 17.) The Court finds the settlement and requested attorney fees are reasonable. However, the following issue precludes the granting of the petition at this time: Counsel has not listed all medical service providers that furnished care and treatment to claimant and were paid (or will be paid from the proceeds) by petitioner/counsel, for which payment petitioner/counsel requests reimbursement. Counsel requests $3,903.51 in medical expenses but has only listed medical providers whose charges amount to $1,842.56.

Counsel is ordered to file supplemental documents naming the other medical providers and the amount charged by each five court days before the next hearing, April 22, 2022 at 1:30 p.m.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.


Case Number: *******6437 Hearing Date: April 22, 2022 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

The Court excuses the personal appearance of the claimant and the guardian ad litem. Counsel may appear by telephone or video conference call.

The Court has reviewed the Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor (Steffan Gilani, age 17.) The Court finds the settlement and requested attorney fees are reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petition.

OSC re: Proof of Deposit into Blocked Account June 17, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. If rceipt is filed with the court, counsel is not required to appear.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON EDOR G. III ESQ.