Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 20:01:30 (UTC).

SALVADOR MORENO VS NORMA GIORGI,, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 SALVADOR MORENO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NORMA GIORGI,, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4563

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO SALVADOR

Defendants

GIORGI NORMA AN INDIVIDUAL DBA KATY'S BAKERY

RODRIGUEZ NICOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAMI POUYA B. ESQ.

CHAMI POUYA B.

CHAMI POUYA

Defendant Attorney

MOHAJERIAN AL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER TO ANSWER)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER TO ANSWER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER TO ANSWER) OF 04/14/2021

4/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER TO ANSWER) OF 04/14/2021

Notice of Ruling

4/14/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/4/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER

4/7/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NEW HEARING TIME ON DEMURRER TO AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS NORMA GIORGI DBA KATYS BAKERY AND NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ

3/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NEW HEARING TIME ON DEMURRER TO AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS NORMA GIORGI DBA KATYS BAKERY AND NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS NORMA GIORGI DBA KATY'S BAKERY AND NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ

4/1/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS NORMA GIORGI DBA KATY'S BAKERY AND NICOLAS RODRIGUEZ

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/9/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Answer

2/26/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/01/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

3/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/01/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

2/1/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

2/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Complaint

11/19/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/23/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • Hearing08/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Pouya Chami (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Norma Giorgi,, an individual (Defendant); Nicolas Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer to Answer) of 04/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer to Answer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketReply (in Support of Plaintiff's Demurrer to Defendants' Amended Answer); Filed by Salvador Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/01/2021, Final Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Norma Giorgi,, an individual (Defendant); Nicolas Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension); Filed by Salvador Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Norma Giorgi,, an individual (Defendant); Nicolas Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Salvador Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Salvador Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Salvador Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less