This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2022 at 12:25:57 (UTC).

SALVADOR, LAINEZ - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 SALVADOR, LAINEZ - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1956

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REYES ESVIN

Decedent

SALVADOR LAINEZ

Not Classified By Court

MAINSTAIN MORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FARMER JERLISIA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

12/16/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

12/16/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

12/28/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

1/21/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

2/18/2022: Proof of Publication

Affidavit - Affidavit

3/17/2022: Affidavit - Affidavit

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

4/8/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

4/5/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

4/5/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARMER JERLISIA ESQ