This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2018 at 05:55:03 (UTC).

SALVADOR GONZALEZ ET AL VS CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 SALVADOR GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4743

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GONZALEZ MARIA LUISA

GONZALEZ CARMEN

GONZALEZ SALVADOR

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING

RAMIREZ OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WOLFBERG DANIEL B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

4/23/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/13/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Unknown

6/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

6/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

6/12/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/12/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/12/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons (A/T MICHELLE HERRERA, PERSON IN CHARGE AT OFFICE, BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLFBERG DANIEL BERNARD