This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 00:43:18 (UTC).

SALVADOR GAMBOA VS JOSE FELIX OLIVER, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 SALVADOR GAMBOA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE FELIX OLIVER, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0299

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAMBOA SALVADOR

Defendants

MANCHESTER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC.

OLIVER JOSE FELIX JR. AKA JOSE FELIX OLIVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES AYINDE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO APP...)

5/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO APP...)

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERRENCE

3/15/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERRENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

3/1/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/07/2022

3/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/07/2022

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/10/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/21/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/2/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/3/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • Hearing08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure of Plaintiff's Counsel to App...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERRENCE); Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/07/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by salvador gamboa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANCHESTER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES AYINDE A