This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 13:09:41 (UTC).

SALVADOR CHAVEZ VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 SALVADOR CHAVEZ filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0503

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ SALVADOR

Defendants

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

TOLMOYAN ANI

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY 2. FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT CONCEALMENT

2/22/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY 2. FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT CONCEALMENT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

2/22/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/14/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • Hearing08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: SALVADOR CHAVEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SALVADOR CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY 2. FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT CONCEALMENT; Filed by: SALVADOR CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: SALVADOR CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SALVADOR CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SALVADOR CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less