This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:35:57 (UTC).

SALVADOR CAMACHO VS LA MASTER PLUMBERS INC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 SALVADOR CAMACHO filed an Other lawsuit against LA MASTER PLUMBERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9252

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAMACHO SALVADOR

Defendants and Respondents

LA MASTER PLUMBERS INC

L.A. MASTER PLUMBERS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LABOR COMMISSIONER'S STAT OF CALIFORNIA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER

4/13/2017: REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER

REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT

4/13/2017: REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

7/21/2017: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

Assignment of Judgment

2/21/2019: Assignment of Judgment

Request for Refund / Order

6/3/2019: Request for Refund / Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • Request for Refund / Order; Filed by L.A. Master Plumbers, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by Salvador Camacho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by Salvador Camacho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Request; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Request; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less