Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2020 at 10:29:26 (UTC).

SALDIVAR, RAFAEL, JR VS SALDIVAR, NATASHA TOLEDO

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 SALDIVAR, RAFAEL, JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SALDIVAR, NATASHA TOLEDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0690

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALDIVAR RAFAEL JR

Respondent

SALDIVAR NATASHA TOLEDO

 

Court Documents

Notice - Rejection - -of Amended Petition of 06/22/2020

6/22/2020: Notice - Rejection - -of Amended Petition of 06/22/2020

Petition - Amended (1st)

6/30/2020: Petition - Amended (1st)

Summons

6/30/2020: Summons

Summons

5/20/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/20/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

5/20/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/20/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/20/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

5/20/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Amended (1st); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (-of Amended Petition of 06/22/2020 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less