Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2021 at 13:26:40 (UTC).

SALDANA, ELIZABETH VS SALDANA, ANICETO

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 SALDANA, ELIZABETH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SALDANA, ANICETO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1924

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALDANA ELIZABETH

Respondent

SALDANA ANICETO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTINEZ-COUOH CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

12/21/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Notice - Voiding of Filing

1/13/2021: Notice - Voiding of Filing

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

12/23/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

Declaration - UCCJEA

12/21/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/21/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/21/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

12/21/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Voiding of Filing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ-COUOH CARLOS