This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 16:04:01 (UTC).

SALBI YAQUBI VS CITY OF GLENDALE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 SALBI YAQUBI filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0210

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAQUBI SALBI

Defendants

BIDDLES IVAN

CITY OF GLENDALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVAKIAN HOURIG

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/1/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/2/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/2/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/7/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Complaint

3/7/2023: Amended Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2023
  • Hearing07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • Hearing05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Name Extension: (1st)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint (1st Amended): Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint (1st Amended) ; As To Parties changed from IVAN BIDDLES (Defendant), CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant) to CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant), IVAN BIDDLES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: SALBI YAQUBI (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant); IVAN BIDDLES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SALBI YAQUBI (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant); IVAN BIDDLES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SALBI YAQUBI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SALBI YAQUBI (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant); IVAN BIDDLES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SALBI YAQUBI (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant); IVAN BIDDLES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SALBI YAQUBI (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant); IVAN BIDDLES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less