Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 03:32:10 (UTC).

SALAZAR, ALEJANDRA VS CEDILLO ZAMORA, JUAN JOSE

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 SALAZAR, ALEJANDRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CEDILLO ZAMORA, JUAN JOSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1941

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALAZAR ALEJANDRA

Respondent

CEDILLO ZAMORA JUAN JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTINEZ-COUOH CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Request - Enter Default FL165

2/9/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

2/9/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

1/7/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons

12/22/2020: Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

12/22/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

12/22/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/22/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

12/22/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

12/22/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/22/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ-COUOH CARLOS