This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 10:56:28 (UTC).

SALAS & COMPANY LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS VICTOR MANUEL MEJICANOS ARGUETA

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 SALAS COMPANY LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTOR MANUEL MEJICANOS ARGUETA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0204

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAS & COMPANY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CAMINO FINANCIAL

Defendant

MEJICANOS ARGUETA VICTOR MANUEL DBA VIZIOTECH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/3/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/3/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SALAS & COMPANY LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SALAS & COMPANY LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SALAS & COMPANY LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SALAS & COMPANY LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salas & Co (LLC) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V