*******2608
02/07/2023
Other
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Los Angeles, California
TOFIGHI SALAR
GELCO FLEET TRUST
JOHNSON CONTROLS INC.
JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC
TSOSIE DALE
SEROPIAN JACOB H.
2/7/2023: Complaint
2/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
2/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
2/7/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
2/7/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE
2/7/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS
2/7/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
2/7/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
5/1/2023: Request for Dismissal
DocketOn the Complaint filed by SALAR TOFIGHI on 02/07/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by SALAR TOFIGHI as to the entire action
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2023
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2023
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2023
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31
[-] Read Less