This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2023 at 08:42:34 (UTC).

SALAR TOFIGHI VS JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 SALAR TOFIGHI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2608

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOFIGHI SALAR

Defendants

GELCO FLEET TRUST

JOHNSON CONTROLS INC.

JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC

TSOSIE DALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEROPIAN JACOB H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/7/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/7/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

2/7/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

2/7/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/7/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/7/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Request for Dismissal

5/1/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SALAR TOFIGHI on 02/07/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by SALAR TOFIGHI as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SALAR TOFIGHI (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC (Defendant); JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Defendant); DALE TSOSIE (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less