This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 15:15:22 (UTC).

SALAMUDIN JAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 SALAMUDIN JAN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0788

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAN AN INDIVIDUAL SALAMUDIN

Defendants

DRIVER AN INDIVIDUAL DOE

USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WASTE MANAGEMENT RECYCLING AND DISPOSAL SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANGOLI SHAWN L.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2024
  • Hearing08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SALAMUDIN JAN, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SALAMUDIN JAN, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SALAMUDIN JAN, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SALAMUDIN JAN, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SALAMUDIN JAN, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE MANAGEMENT RECYCLING AND DISPOSAL SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANGOLI SHAHRAM