This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 12:22:44 (UTC).

SAINI SINGH VS ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 SAINI SINGH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0123

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGH SAINI

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CONWAY JAMES JR.

DEVONSHIRE LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF THE SOUTHWEST INC. ROE 2

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC. ROE 1

THE SALVATION ARMY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION ROE 4

VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC ROE 3

ROE 5 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC. DOE 3 DBA CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS CCI INC.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

CONWAY JAMES JR.

THE SALVATION ARMY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

THE SALVATION ARMY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DEVONSHIRE LTD.

DEVONSHIRE LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC. DBA CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS CCI INC.

CHARTER COMMUNICATION ROE 1

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLGREEN CHRIS A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GRAVEN JOSEPH C. DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

DIAMOND SCOTT RORY

JOFFE STEVEN

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BOUCHE JACQUELINE ESQ.

AREVALO ERIC

Cross Defendant Attorney

HENKE ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

11/6/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/6/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/6/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/6/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

11/6/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/9/2019: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/2/2019: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/3/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

8/19/2019: Answer

Answer

8/6/2019: Answer

Notice of Ruling

7/30/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL CUT-OFF DATES

7/30/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL CUT-OFF DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (ROE 5) TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES

7/30/2019: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (ROE 5) TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/15/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • Hearing10/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Hearing03/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Hearing02/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (doe 3) (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (DOE 3) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (doe 3) (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (DOE 3) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (doe 3) (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Saini Singh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Saini Singh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Saini Singh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Saini Singh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Saini Singh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) FIRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Saini Singh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Saini Singh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0123    Hearing Date: January 03, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SAINI SINGH,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: ****0123

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 3, 2020

Plaintiff, Saini Singh filed this action against Defendants, ACF Property Management, Inc., James Jr. Conway, and the Salvation Army for damages arising out of an automobile accident.  Plaintiff filed the original complaint on 10/18/17, and filed an FAC on 3/13/18.  Numerous parties have been added by way of Doe and Roe amendments.  On 10/02/19, 10/03/19, and 10/09/19, Charter Communications, Inc. was added to the complaint and cross-complaints by way of doe and roe amendments.  

Trial is currently scheduled for 3/06/20.  Charter Communications moves to continue trial.  It argues it was only recently added to the case, it has had insufficient time to conduct discovery, it needs time to review the case and consider settlement options, and it needs time to prepare for trial and file a dispositive motion if necessary.  Charter Communications filed its answer to the complaint and cross-complaints on 11/06/19, only four months prior to the currently scheduled trial date. 

Plaintiff opposes the motion.  Plaintiff concedes a trial continuance is necessary, but contends the case is a simple automobile accident case, and suggests trial should be continued to no later than August of 2020.

The Court finds Defendant’s very recent addition to the case constitutes good cause for a continuance of the trial date.  The Court finds the request to continue the action to November of 2020 reasonable, as defendants typically have more than one year to prepare for trial once named in civil actions. 

The 3/06/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Wednesday, 11/04/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  The 2/21/20 FSC date is advanced to today’s date and continued to 10/21/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3.  All discovery cut-off deadlines are continued to reflect the new trial date.  Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEVONSHIRE LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE SALVATION ARMY is a litigant