This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 07:28:37 (UTC).

SAIDE LUGO VS YASSINE AMALLAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 SAIDE LUGO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YASSINE AMALLAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS W. STERN, MARK V. MOONEY and MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7590

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DOUGLAS W. STERN

MARK V. MOONEY

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

LUGO SAIDE

Respondents and Defendants

AMALLAL YASSINE

BUCIO LORENA

INGLE JANETH AKA JANETH DARDON

MONTALVO JOSE

PIXIOR LLC

TAJOUIDI MOHAMMAD AMINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BINDER DAVID S.

Defendant Attorney

FARIVAR ESQ. FAHIM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATIO9 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT...)

5/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATIO9 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATIO9 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT...) OF 05/16/2023, STIPULATION

5/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATIO9 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT...) OF 05/16/2023, STIPULATION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/16/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice of Continuance

5/16/2023: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ANTI-SLAPP ...)

5/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ANTI-SLAPP ...)

Unknown - APPEAL - ORIGINAL CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT 1 VOLUMES CERTIFIED

4/24/2023: Unknown - APPEAL - ORIGINAL CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT 1 VOLUMES CERTIFIED

Case Management Statement

4/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL N.O.A. 10/26/22; B324368; RE: OMISSION

3/29/2023: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL N.O.A. 10/26/22; B324368; RE: OMISSION

Unknown - APPEAL - ORIGINAL CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT 5 VOLUMES CERTIFIED B324368

3/1/2023: Unknown - APPEAL - ORIGINAL CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT 5 VOLUMES CERTIFIED B324368

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/27/2023

2/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/27/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL NOA 10/26/2022 B324368

2/6/2023: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL NOA 10/26/2022 B324368

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL NOA 10/26/2022 B324368

2/6/2023: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL NOA 10/26/2022 B324368

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/10/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript

12/19/2022: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/16/2022: Case Management Statement

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Yassine Amallal (Defendant); Janeth Ingle (Defendant); Jose Montalvo (Defendant); Pixior, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Saide Lugo (Plaintiff); As to: Pixior, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: Saide Lugo (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order RE: JOINT STIPULATIO9 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order RE: JOINT STIPULATIO9 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT...) of 05/16/2023, Stipulation; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Anti-SLAPP Motion scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Anti-SLAPP ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketAddress for David S. Binder (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Saide Lugo (Plaintiff); As to: YASSINE AMALLAL (Defendant); JANETH INGLE (Defendant); MOHAMMAD AMINE TAJOUIDI (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Saide Lugo (Plaintiff); As to: YASSINE AMALLAL (Defendant); JANETH INGLE (Defendant); MOHAMMAD AMINE TAJOUIDI (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Saide Lugo (Plaintiff); As to: YASSINE AMALLAL (Defendant); JANETH INGLE (Defendant); MOHAMMAD AMINE TAJOUIDI (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less