Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 18:31:25 (UTC).

SAHAKIAN, LISA VS MANN, TERI SUE

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 SAHAKIAN, LISA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against MANN, TERI SUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSEN, DAVID A. and SANCHEZ DUFOUR, ROBERT E.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0039

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSEN, DAVID A.

SANCHEZ DUFOUR, ROBERT E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAHAKIAN LISA

Respondent

MANN TERI SUE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/12/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/21/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

4/20/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Minute Order

4/21/2021: Minute Order

FL_General Family Law - CV-Certificate of Mailing

3/1/2021: FL_General Family Law - CV-Certificate of Mailing

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/1/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

FL_General Family Law - CV-Certificate of Mailing

3/1/2021: FL_General Family Law - CV-Certificate of Mailing

Proof of Service - CH100, CH109, CH110

2/16/2021: Proof of Service - CH100, CH109, CH110

Minute Order

2/17/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/17/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - CH-109, CH-110, CH-100, CH-120, CH-120 INFO

2/17/2021: Proof of Service - CH-109, CH-110, CH-100, CH-120, CH-120 INFO

Proof of Service - CH100, CH109, CH110

2/10/2021: Proof of Service - CH100, CH109, CH110

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/12/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partly granted

1/12/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partly granted

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/12/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/12/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Petition - Civil Harassment

1/12/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F48, Sanchez DuFour, Robert E., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F50, Rosen, David A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Rosen, David A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (CH-109, CH-110, CH-100, CH-120, CH-120 INFO service by petitioner ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (CH100, CH109, served by petitioner ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (CH100, CH109, CH110 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Partly granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less