This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 20:09:46 (UTC).

SAGHAR YADEGAR, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SAMIRA YADEGAR VS NESTOR R. GONZALEZ, MD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 SAGHAR YADEGAR, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SAMIRA YADEGAR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NESTOR R GONZALEZ, MD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7154

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YADEGAR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM SAMIRA YADEGAR SAGHAR

Defendants

BARNARD MD ZACHARY

CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM

GONZALEZ MD NESTOR R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HODES DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

GONZALEZ MICHAEL DALE

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/17/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

5/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS

6/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE DISMISSAL OF ZACHARY BARNARD, M.D., WITH PREJUDICE

6/20/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE DISMISSAL OF ZACHARY BARNARD, M.D., WITH PREJUDICE

Demand for Jury Trial

6/20/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/20/2022: Answer

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/22/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/3/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LORRAINE KIM HALL RE MEET AND CONFER ON COMPLAINT, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTIONS 430.41 AND 435.5 AND AUTOMATIC EXTENSION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 AND 435.5 AND AUTOMATIC

4/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LORRAINE KIM HALL RE MEET AND CONFER ON COMPLAINT, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTIONS 430.41 AND 435.5 AND AUTOMATIC EXTENSION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 AND 435.5 AND AUTOMATIC

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SAGHAR

2/10/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SAGHAR

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

2/2/2022: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SAGHAR

1/27/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SAGHAR

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/27/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2024
  • Hearing12/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • Hearing06/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Nestor R. Gonzalez, MD (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Trial Attorney for Defendants); Filed by Nestor R. Gonzalez, MD (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Nestor R. Gonzalez, MD (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (REGARDING THE DISMISSAL OF ZACHARY BARNARD, M.D., WITH PREJUDICE); Filed by Nestor R. Gonzalez, MD (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nestor R. Gonzalez, MD (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nestor R. Gonzalez, MD (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Saghar Yadegar, by and through her guardian ad litem, Samira Yadegar (Plaintiff); Nestor R. Gonzalez, MD (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Saghar Yadegar, by and through her guardian ad litem, Samira Yadegar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Saghar); Filed by Saghar Yadegar, by and through her guardian ad litem, Samira Yadegar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction ((re Summons 12/28/21)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Saghar); Filed by Saghar Yadegar, by and through her guardian ad litem, Samira Yadegar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Saghar Yadegar, by and through her guardian ad litem, Samira Yadegar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Saghar Yadegar, by and through her guardian ad litem, Samira Yadegar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HODES DANIEL