This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 01:28:56 (UTC).

SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC VS TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 03/15/2018 SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0120

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAFEWAY ELECTRIC

SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC

Defendants

OAK PARK MANOR LP

TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANAK & HANNA P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

KREIS JOHN P. ESQ.

PITRE RANDALL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Lis Pendens

12/17/2018: Notice of Lis Pendens

Request for Dismissal

12/12/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

04/23/2019

DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by OAK PARK MANOR LP (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2019

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2018

DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2018

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018

DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2018

DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2018

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2018

DocketNotice; Filed by SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2018

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Court Order - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2018

DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2018

DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2018

DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC (Plaintiff); SAFEWAY ELECTRIC (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2018

DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC (Plaintiff); SAFEWAY ELECTRIC (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2018

DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2018

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2018

DocketComplaint; Filed by SAFEWAY BUILDING SYSTEMS INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less