Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 00:40:54 (UTC).

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA VS JEANNETTE HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEANNETTE HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1301

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Respondent

HERNANDEZ JEANNETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MARTINEZ BRYAN

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH A DULY SERVED DEPOSITION SDT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AGAINST ENCINO PLACE PAIN MANAGEMENT ANESTHESIOLOGY & REQUEST FOR

3/12/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH A DULY SERVED DEPOSITION SDT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AGAINST ENCINO PLACE PAIN MANAGEMENT ANESTHESIOLOGY & REQUEST FOR

PI General Order

2/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION PETITION TO OPEN UNDERINSURED MOTORIST DISCOVERY CASE

1/12/2021: Petition - PETITION PETITION TO OPEN UNDERINSURED MOTORIST DISCOVERY CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Hearing08/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH A DULY SERVED DEPOSITION SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AGAINST ENCINO PLACE PAIN MANAGEMENT ANESTHESIOLOGY AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 511.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Compliance with a Duly Served Deposition SDT, or in the Alternative for an Order to Show Cause against Encino Place Pain Management Anesthesiology & Request for Monetary Sanctions); Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPetition (Petition to Open Underinsured Motorist Discovery Case); Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ BRYAN