This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 11:38:52 (UTC).

SAFAA AL LABABIDI VS VANESSA DELGADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 SAFAA AL LABABIDI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against VANESSA DELGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0522

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LABABIDI SAFAA AL

Defendants

AZURE DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BELLFLOWER CEDAR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BELLFLOWER MANAGER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BUILDING OFFICIAL OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER THE GOVERNING BODY OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

CITY MANAGER OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

CITY OF BELLFLOWER A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

DELGADO VANESSA

PLANNING COMMISSION OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

PLANNING DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KURTZHALL PAUL JOSEPH

HALLSTROM DAVID J.

Defendant Attorneys

CHA JOHN SUNG

CARLE NATHANIEL MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; (PROPOSED) ORDER

10/6/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; (PROPOSED) ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case

9/2/2021: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Vanessa Delgado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; (PROPOSED) ORDER); Filed by City of Bellflower, a municipal corporation (Defendant); City Council of the City of Bellflower, the governing body of the City of Bellflower (Defendant); Planning Department of the City of Bellflower (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZURE DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BELLFLOWER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KURTZHALL PAUL JOSEPH