This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 03:25:02 (UTC).

SAFAA AL LABABIDI VS CITY OF BELLFLOWER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 SAFAA AL LABABIDI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF BELLFLOWER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2631

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AL LABABIDI SAFAA

Respondents

BUILDING OFFICIAL OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER THE GOVERNING BODY OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

CITY MANAGER OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

CITY OF BELLFLOWER A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

PLANNING COMMISSION OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

PLANNING DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF BELLFLOWER

Interested Parties

AZURE DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BELLFLOWER CEDAR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BELLFLOWER MANAGER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DELGADO VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KURTZHALL PAUL JOSEPH

Interested Party Attorney

CARLE NATHANIEL MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)

11/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING CLOSE OF ESCROW AND PROPOSED ORDER

11/15/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING CLOSE OF ESCROW AND PROPOSED ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE

10/25/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; (PROPOSED) ORDER

10/7/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; (PROPOSED) ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATHAN M. CARLE IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE

9/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATHAN M. CARLE IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 09/23/2021

9/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 09/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE

9/23/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL KURTZHALL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

9/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL KURTZHALL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

9/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GRANT HALLSTROM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

9/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GRANT HALLSTROM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Motion for Preliminary Injunction

9/3/2021: Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Request for Judicial Notice

9/3/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MOE KABAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

9/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MOE KABAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Order - ORDER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

9/7/2021: Order - ORDER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

9/1/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

9/1/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

9/1/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Stay Litigation Pending Close of Escrow and Proposed Order); Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Order to Show Cause Re: (Preliminary Injunction) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Order to Show Cause Re: (Preliminary Injunction) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [proposed] Order to Continue Hearing On Petitioners Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Modify Briefing Schedule); Filed by City of Bellflower, a municipal corporation (Respondent); City Council of the City of Bellflower, the governing body of the City of Bellflower (Respondent); Planning Department of the City of Bellflower (Respondent) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandate; (Proposed) Order); Filed by City of Bellflower, a municipal corporation (Respondent); City Council of the City of Bellflower, the governing body of the City of Bellflower (Respondent); Planning Department of the City of Bellflower (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Order to Show Cause Re: (Preliminary Injunction) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Safaa Al Lababidi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZURE DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BELLFLOWER is a litigant