This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 19:46:23 (UTC).

SAEID YAHYAKASHANI VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 SAEID YAHYAKASHANI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9652

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAHYAKASHANI SAEID

Defendants

CADILLAC OF BEVERLY HILLS

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YASHAR NADIA

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Case Management Statement

12/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

10/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PLAINTIFF SAEID YAHYAKASHANI INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF

10/13/2022: Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PLAINTIFF SAEID YAHYAKASHANI INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF

Case Management Statement

9/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

9/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

5/18/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

7/15/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

3/18/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAddress for Nadia Yashar (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Saeid Yahyakashani (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Cadillac of Beverly Hills (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Saeid Yahyakashani (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Cadillac of Beverly Hills (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Saeid Yahyakashani (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Cadillac of Beverly Hills (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CADILLAC OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YASHAR NADIA