This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 00:00:31 (UTC).

SAEEDEH PAYROVY VS NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 SAEEDEH PAYROVY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4050

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAYROVY SAEEDEH

Defendants

A-1 SOLAR POWER INC.

CANOPY ENERGY

NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KITSON ROBERT M

Defendant Attorney

WANG WILLIE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLMNT RE: DOE 1 (RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER) SERVED ON NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLMNT RE: DOE 1 (RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER) SERVED ON NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RE: DOE 1 (RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER) SERVED ON CANOPY ENERGY

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RE: DOE 1 (RENEWABLE ENERGY CENTER) SERVED ON CANOPY ENERGY

Proof of Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Service

Minute Order

3/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/11/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/12/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/24/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/24/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

5/30/2018: Minute Order

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

7/20/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

7/20/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

7/20/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

7/20/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/23/2018: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/23/2018: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/23/2018: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/23/2018: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

7/24/2018: Minute Order

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Canopy Energy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Saeedeh Payrovy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Canopy Energy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default and default judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:59 PM in Department 40; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 02/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Saeedeh Payrovy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Saeedeh Payrovy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DECLARATORY RELIEF 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4050    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 40

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff’s Counsel Robert M. Kitson and The Myers Law Group

OPPOSITION: None

Counsel Robert M. Kitson and The Myers Law Group (hereinafter, “Counsel”), moves to be relieved as the attorney of record of Plaintiff Saeedeh Payrovy (“Plaintiff”).

Counsel has filed form MC-051, notice, as required by CRC Rule 3.1362. Counsel has filed form MC-052, a declaration, pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1362. However, Counsel has not lodged a proposed order, form MC-053.

Counsel served this motion on Defendants’ counsel via mail. Counsel also served Plaintiff at their last known mailing address, which Counsel confirmed as current within 30 days of the motion via a process service report. Counsel indicates that he will bring the process service report with them if the Court needs to examine it.

Counsel states that there are irreconcilable differences between themselves and Plaintiff. The current trial date is three months away, March 4, 2020.

Conclusion: The Court will grant the motion if on March 4, 2020, Counsel provides a proposed order for signature. Counsel to provide notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A1 SOLAR POWER INC AKA DAVID MACK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KITSON ROBERT M. ESQ.