Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 22:44:17 (UTC).

SABRINA ALFARANO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ANDREW TRAPANI ENTERTAINMENT LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 SABRINA ALFARANO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ANDREW TRAPANI ENTERTAINMENT LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9996

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFARANO AN INDIVIDUAL SABRINA

Defendants

ANDREW TRAPANI ENTERTAINMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TRAPANI AN INDIVIDUAL ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/26/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • Hearing09/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SABRINA ALFARANO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SABRINA ALFARANO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SABRINA ALFARANO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SABRINA ALFARANO, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R