This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 20:43:33 (UTC).

SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY, LLC VS CARLOS CASTELLANOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CARLOS CASTELLANOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0141

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY LLC

Defendants

CASTELLANOS CARLOS

CASTELLANOS JR CARLOS

CASTELLANOS PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATOFSKY JEFF

Defendant Attorney

HARTMAN WILLIAM MICHAEL II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketOrder Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Motion to set aside/vacate Default); Filed by SAB Investment Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Staying Execution and for Order shortening Time or Service of Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Execution a...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) On Additional Court Fees, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) On Additional Court Fees, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) On Additional Court Fees]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (On Additional Court Fees); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SAB Investment Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Carlos Castellanos)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Patricia Castellanos)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Carlos Castellanos, JR)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SAB Investment Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SAB Investment Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SAB Investment Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY LLC is a litigant