This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2019 at 10:35:55 (UTC).

S TERESA ALFARO VS HYDE REAL ESTATE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 S TERESA ALFARO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HYDE REAL ESTATE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6663

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

HYDE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

HYDE REAL ESTATE LLC

DOES 1 TO 30

Guardian Ad Litems and Not Yet Classified

ALFARO S. TERESA

FLORES KEVIN

Minor and Not Yet Classified

FLORES KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WILCOX WENDY L. ESQ.

Minor Attorney

HEMMING MICHAEL G.

Other Attorneys

HEMMING MICHAEL GERALD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL))

12/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL))

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

6/20/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

8/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL))

8/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

5/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

Notice of Settlement

5/8/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 05/08/2019

5/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 05/08/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/8/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

3/23/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY BASED ON NEGLIGENCE AND PREMISES LIABILITY

2/28/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY BASED ON NEGLIGENCE AND PREMISES LIABILITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • Hearing01/22/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((conditional)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((conditional)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by S. Teresa Alfaro (Legacy Party); Kevin Flores (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement of Entire ...) of 05/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement of Entire ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hyde Real Estate LLC (Defendant); Hyde Property Management LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY BASED ON NEGLIGENCE AND PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696663    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Kevin Flores (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his parent, S. Teresa Alfaro (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendants Hyde Real Estate LLC and Hyde property Management LLC in exchange for $27,500.00. If approved, $490.80 will be used for medical expenses, $9,075.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $2,933.40 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $15,000.80 for Claimant, to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. The fee is reasonable given the work and time expended by the attorneys. However, Item 13b.(4)(a) is checked but no copy of the notice to the State Director of Health Care Services under Welfare and Institutions Code section 14124.73 is attached. Petitioner is to file a copy of the notice before the hearing.

Subject the filing of that notice, the unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the January 22, 2020 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

The Court sets an OSC re filing proof of deposit into the blocked account for April 3, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 27.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.