This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2021 at 16:29:01 (UTC).

S P F LOGISTICS INC VS FRANCO TRUCKING INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 S P F LOGISTICS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANCO TRUCKING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7895

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

S.P.F. LOGISTICS INC.

Respondents and Defendants

FRANCO TRUCKING INC.

RAMIREZ MIGUEL

DOES 1 TO 10

COATE AGUSTIN JUAREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

VIVOLI MICHAEL W.

VIVOLI MICHAEL WARREN

Defendant Attorney

O'MEARA JOHN V. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT, MIGUEL RAMIREZ' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/23/2018: DEFENDANT, MIGUEL RAMIREZ' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, AGUSTIN JUAREZ COATES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/23/2018: DEFENDANT, AGUSTIN JUAREZ COATES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, FRANCO TRUCKING, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/23/2018: DEFENDANT, FRANCO TRUCKING, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

11/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/17/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by S.P.F. Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by S.P.F. Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, MIGUEL RAMIREZ' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, AGUSTIN JUAREZ COATES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Miguel Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Agustin Juarez Coate (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Franco Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, FRANCO TRUCKING, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by S.P.F. Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by S.P.F. Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by S.P.F. Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by S.P.F. Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANCO TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where S.P.F. LOGISTICS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'MEARA, JOHN V