This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2022 at 02:49:43 (UTC).

S NAZARYAN ET AL VS GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 S NAZARYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK M. TAVELMAN, ANTHONY MOHR, PATRICIA D. NIETO and WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7944

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK M. TAVELMAN

ANTHONY MOHR

PATRICIA D. NIETO

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff

KARAPETYAN ANNA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

DOES 1-100

HAGOPIAN DEREK

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

GLENDALE CITY OF

GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GLENDALE

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

HAGOPIAN GAYANE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Respondents and Cross Defendants

GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

HAGOPIAN GAYANE

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Respondents

HAGOPIAN DEREK

GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

HAGOPIAN GALOUST DOE 2

DOE GUARDIAN AD LITEM #1

DOE GUARDIAN AD LITEM #2

DOE PARENT #1

DOE PARENT #2

Minor

NAZARYAN S

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

BELORYAN & MANUKYAN LLP

BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DOUMANIAN NANCY P. ESQ.

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVIS BRUCE L

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

9/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR ONE DAY FROM 9/27/22 TO 9/28/22 TO ALLOW FOR MSC WITH JUDGE JAMES DUNN ON 9/27/22

9/22/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR ONE DAY FROM 9/27/22 TO 9/28/22 TO ALLOW FOR MSC WITH JUDGE JAMES DUNN ON 9/27/22

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/6/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE VACATING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES AND SETTING AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) HEARING ON 11/17/22

10/6/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE VACATING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES AND SETTING AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) HEARING ON 11/17/22

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT)

10/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, JURY TRIAL AND STATUS CONFERENCE

9/30/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, JURY TRIAL AND STATUS CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL AND STIPULATION TO OTHER MATTERS

9/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL AND STIPULATION TO OTHER MATTERS

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL AND STIPULATION TO OTHER MATTERS

9/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL AND STIPULATION TO OTHER MATTERS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; JURY TRIAL)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; JURY TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL BY ONE DAY

9/26/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL BY ONE DAY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/18/2017: Complaint

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORD APPTNG GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/24/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORD APPTNG GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Summons

5/9/2017: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

6/7/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

6/8/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

6/9/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/14/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

260 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • Hearing11/17/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Re Vacating Trial and Final Status Conference Dates and Setting an Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal (Settlement) Hearing on 11/17/22); Filed by Glendale Unified School District (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Frank M. Tavelman, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A; Status Conference (re settlement agreement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial; Status Conference re settlement agreement)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Regarding Final Status Conference, Jury Trial and Status Conference); Filed by Glendale Unified School District (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department A; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department A, Frank M. Tavelman, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Time to Bring Case to Trial and Stipulation to Other Matters); Filed by S. Nazaryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
364 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR SAMUEL NAZARYAN ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by S Nazaryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. ASSAULT/BATTERY; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR S. NAZARYAN GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7944    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: A

Nazaryan v Glendale USD

Motion to Compel Deposition (x2)

Calendar:

11

Case No.:

****7944

Hearing Date:

January 10, 2020

Action Filed:

April 18, 2017

Trial Date:

April 06, 2020

MP:

Plaintiff S. Nazaryan, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Anna Karapetyan

RP:

N/A

ALLEGATIONS:

The instant action arises out of personal injuries suffered by Plaintiff S. Nazaryan (“Plaintiff”), as alleged by and through his guardian ad litem Anna Karapetyan, when Defendant Derek Hagopian (“Derek”) allegedly assaulted and battered Plaintiff on the grounds of Herbert Hoover High School, which part of Defendant Glendale Unified School District (“GUSD”) on or about April 20, 2016, at approximately 11:30 AM.

Plaintiff filed his Complaint on April 18, 2017, alleging five causes of action for (1) Assault/Battery, (2) Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress (“IIED”), (3) Negligence, (4) Negligent Supervision of Students, and (5) Negligent Hiring, Training, Supervision, and Retention of Employees.

GUSD filed a Cross-Complaint on July 14, 2017, against Derek and Doe guardians of Hagopian, alleging five causes of action for (1) Indemnity, (2) Declaratory Relief, (3) Negligence, (4) Statutory Parental Liability (Civ. Code ;1714.1), and (5) Assault & Battery.

Doe 1, Gayane Hacopian (“Gayane”), filed a Cross-Complaint against GUSD on May 24, 2018, alleging three causes of action for (1) Indemnification, (2) Apportionment of Fault, and (3) Declaratory Relief.

PRESENTATION:

Plaintiff filed the instant motions on December 10, 2019. No opposition has been received, and Plaintiff filed a notice of non-opposition on each motion on January 07, 2020.

RELIEF REQUESTED:

Plaintiff moves to compel the deposition of Dr. Jennifer Earl together with $2,160.00 in sanctions.

Plaintiff moves to compel the deposition of Haig Eulmessekian together with $2,160.00 in sanctions.

DISCUSSION:

Standard of Review – Code of Civil Procedure ;2025.450 permits a party to seek a motion to compel a deposition where a deponent fails to appear or produce documents at a deposition. The motion is permissible after a party fails to appear without having served a valid objection pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure ;2025.410. Code of Civil Procedure ;2025.450(a). The motion must include specific facts demonstrating good cause for the production of documents or items, and must be accompanied by a declaration setting forth facts demonstrating that a good faith and reasonable attempt at informal resolution has been made. Code of Civil Procedure ;2025.450(b). Monetary sanctions are mandatory against an unsuccessful moving or opposing party unless they acted with substantial justification or imposition of sanctions would be unjust. Code of Civil Procedure ;2025.450(g)(1).

Both of the proposed deponents are non-retained expert witnesses of GUSD. Pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. ;2034.410, “[o]n receipt of an expert witness list from a party, any other party may take the deposition of any person on the list.” Plaintiff represents that they noticed the deposition of each person subject to the instant motions on or around September 23, 2019, but that GUSD sought to withdraw both from the expert witness list following the notice of depositions. Plaintiff represents that both proposed deponents nevertheless remain named as non-retained expert witnesses on GUSD’s expert witness list. Motion, pp. 3-4.

Without opposition, and pursuant to the plain language in the Code permitting the deposition of any person identified on an expert witness list, the Court will grant the motions.

Sanctions – While sanctions are mandatory, the Court considers 3 hours each for largely identical motions is excessive, nor is the Court inclined to permit a total of 4 hours for travel time and appearance at oral arguments. As such, the Court will permit a total of 4 hours for both motions at the provided rate of $350/hr, together with $120 in filing fees for the motions, resulting in a total award of sanctions in the amount of $1,520.00.

---

RULING: See below

In the event the parties submit on this tentative ruling, or a party requests a signed order or the court in its discretion elects to sign a formal order, the following form will be either electronically signed or signed in hard copy and entered into the court’s records.

ORDER

Plaintiff S. Nazaryan, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Anna Karapetyan’s Motions to Compel Depositions came on regularly for hearing on January 10, 2020, with appearances/submissions as noted in the minute order for said hearing, and the court, being fully advised in the premises, did then and there rule as follows:

THE MOTIONS ARE GRANTED, AND SANCTIONS ARE AWARDED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,520.00.

DATE: _______________ _______________________________

JUDGE



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN