Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 03:03:17 (UTC).

S. C., ET AL. VS GEORGE TYNDALL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 S C filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEORGE TYNDALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6034

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C. J.

C. S.

L. E.

H. S.

B. T.

L. B.

A. K.

J. A.

T. M.

A. V.

J. F.

D. L.

A. M.

R. Y.

C. O.

K. K.

T. S.

Defendants

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TYNDALL GEORGE

TYNDALL DR. GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMPBELL JESSICA

CARLSEN ALI SARAH

Defendant Attorneys

TAYLOR N. DENISE

WILLIAMS MICHAEL ERNEST

FRASER STEPHEN CLARK

CONWAY CATHERINE ANNE

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ADOPTION FORM OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, AS TO PLAINTIFF #00755

8/28/2020: Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ADOPTION FORM OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, AS TO PLAINTIFF #00755

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/18/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice - SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM- PLAINTIFF #00754

5/11/2020: Notice - SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM- PLAINTIFF #00754

Notice - SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM- PLAINTIFF #00760

5/11/2020: Notice - SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM- PLAINTIFF #00760

Answer

3/9/2020: Answer

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF A.K.

3/12/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF A.K.

Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM

3/5/2020: Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM

Other - - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

2/6/2020: Other - - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM

2/6/2020: Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM

Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM

2/6/2020: Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00756

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00756

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00754

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00754

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00757

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00757

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00753

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00753

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00760

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF #00760

Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11/25/2019: Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM PLAINTIFF # 00753

10/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM PLAINTIFF # 00753

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2025
  • Hearing12/31/2025 at 16:30 PM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer (and Affirmative Defenses Adoption Form of Defendant University of Southern California, as to Plaintiff #00756); Filed by University of Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer (and Affirmative Defenses Adoption Form of Defendant University of Southern California, as to Plaintiff #00753); Filed by University of Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer (and Affirmative Defenses Adoption Form of Defendant University of Southern California, as to Plaintiff #00755); Filed by University of Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMotion re: (To Be Relieved As Counsel); Filed by S. C. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (as to S. C. Plaintiff ID 00731) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder (Granting Motion to be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel as to S. C. Plain...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defenses Adoption Form of Defendant University of Southern California as to Plaintiff #00762; Filed by University of Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defenses Adoption Form of Defendant University of Southern California as to Plaintiff #00764; Filed by University of Southern California, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Amended Complaint (1st)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by S. C. (Plaintiff); J. C. (Plaintiff); S. H. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by S. C. (Plaintiff); J. C. (Plaintiff); S. H. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 12:23 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases BC705677- Lead)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by S. C. (Plaintiff); J. C. (Plaintiff); S. H. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by S. C. (Plaintiff); J. C. (Plaintiff); S. H. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by S. C. (Plaintiff); J. C. (Plaintiff); S. H. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by S. C. (Plaintiff); J. C. (Plaintiff); S. H. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLSEN ALI SARAH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Campbell, Jessica L.