Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2020 at 00:53:06 (UTC).

RYAN ROBERT CAMPBELL VS DAVID ROCHA

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 RYAN ROBERT CAMPBELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID ROCHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9372

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPBELL RYAN ROBERT

Defendant

ROCHA DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

SMITH-MARS DENISE A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

6/7/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/7/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/7/2019: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/26/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ryan Robert Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by David Rocha (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by David Rocha (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Rocha (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ryan Robert Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ryan Robert Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ryan Robert Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILBERT DANIEL