This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2022 at 11:54:37 (UTC).

RYAN NAGLESTAD VS BRANDON LEVY

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 RYAN NAGLESTAD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRANDON LEVY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7445

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYAN NAGLESTAD

Defendant

LEVY BRANDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPENCER RICHARD JONATHAN

Defendant Attorney

EISENBAUM MICHAEL S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

12/20/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/20/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

2/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ryan Naglestad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Brandon Levy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brandon Levy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ryan Naglestad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ryan Naglestad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ryan Naglestad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ryan Naglestad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPENCER RICHARD J.