This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 19:27:58 (UTC).

RYAN E. STEARNS INC. VS LARISSA ANDRADE JENKINS

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 RYAN E STEARNS INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against LARISSA ANDRADE JENKINS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2964

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RYAN E. STEARNS INC. DBA STEARNS KIM STEARNS & RYAN

Respondent

JENKINS LARISSA ANDRADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEARNS RYAN EDWARD

Respondent Attorney

HERRERA ALEJANDRO H.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRO H. HERRERA IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER

2/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRO H. HERRERA IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT LARISSA ANDRADE JENKINS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

2/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT LARISSA ANDRADE JENKINS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE DISMIS...)

2/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE DISMIS...)

Reply - REPLY TO THE OSC RE ATTORNEYS FEES

2/22/2022: Reply - REPLY TO THE OSC RE ATTORNEYS FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ORDER RESPO...)

2/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ORDER RESPO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ORDER RESPO...) OF 02/25/2022

2/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ORDER RESPO...) OF 02/25/2022

Response - RESPONSE TO THE OSC REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES

2/4/2022: Response - RESPONSE TO THE OSC REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES

Notice of Ruling

1/18/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; HEARING - OTHER SELECTION ...)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; HEARING - OTHER SELECTION ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; HEARING - OTHER SELECTION ...) OF 01/10/2022

1/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; HEARING - OTHER SELECTION ...) OF 01/10/2022

Notice - NOTICE PETITIONER'S PROPOSED ARBITRATORS

12/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE PETITIONER'S PROPOSED ARBITRATORS

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AMEDNED NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION

11/15/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AMEDNED NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION UNREDACTED -NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION

11/15/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION UNREDACTED -NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION UNREDACTED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION

11/15/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION UNREDACTED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Notice of Ruling

11/30/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION [VERIFIED] COMPELLING ARBITRATION

9/16/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION [VERIFIED] COMPELLING ARBITRATION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the petition should not be dismissed) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: ( why the Court should not order Respondent to pay $6,557.50 in attorney?s fees) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why the Court should not order Respo...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: why the Court should not order Respo...) of 02/25/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketReply (to the OSC RE Attorneys fees); Filed by Ryan E. Stearns Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: ( why the Court should not order Respondent to pay $6,557.50 in attorney?s fees) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the petition should not be dismissed) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why the petition should not be dismis...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Alejandro H. Herrera in Support of Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Request for Order); Filed by Larissa Andrade Jenkins (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Respondent Larissa Andrade Jenkins in Opposition to Petitioner's Request for Attorney's Fees); Filed by Larissa Andrade Jenkins (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (UNREDACTED -Notice of Hearing on Petition NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION); Filed by Ryan E. Stearns Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (Unredacted Notice of Hearing on Petition NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION); Filed by Ryan E. Stearns Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (AMEDNED NOTICE OF HEARING ON (VERIFIED) PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION); Filed by Ryan E. Stearns Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ryan E. Stearns Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition ([Verified] Compelling Arbitration); Filed by Ryan E. Stearns Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ryan E. Stearns Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPetition (Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Ryan E. Stearns Inc. (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******2964 Hearing Date: November 16, 2021 Dept: 39

Ryan E. Stearns, Inc. v. Larissa Andrade Jenkins

Case No. *******2964

Motion to Compel Arbitration

Petitioner filed a petition to compel arbitration on September 8, 2021, seeking to compel arbitration. Respondent hired Petitioner to provide services in connection with her divorce. Petitioner seeks to compel arbitration pursuant to the arbitration clause in the parties’ agreement. This is a proper basis to compel arbitration in this matter.

Respondent has not appeared and does not oppose this petition. The Court questions whether Respondent received proper notice of this hearing. Although Petitioner served a notice on October 1, 2021, the copy of the notice filed with the Court is redacted in its entirety. Therefore, the Court cannot verify whether Respondent received proper notice of the hearing.

Based upon the foregoing, the Court grants the motion and orders the parties to submit to arbitration in this matter. However, this order shall not take effect until Petitioner demonstrates that it provided notice of this hearing to Respondent.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court orders as follows:

1. The Court grants Petitioner’s motion to compel arbitration, though this order is conditioned upon Petitioner demonstrating that it provided proper notice of the hearing date to Respondent.

2. The Court orders Petitioner to file an unredacted copy of the notice of this hearing served upon Respondent on or before November 22, 2021.

3. The Court shall hold an Order to Show Cause why it should not vacate this order on November 30, 2021, at 8:30 a.m.

4. The Court shall hold an Order to Show Cause why it should not close-out this case, arbitration having been ordered, on November 30, 2021, at 8:30 a.m.

5. The Court orders Petitioner to provide notice in a manner calculated to afford proper notice sufficiently in advance of the hearing date of November 30, 2021.

6. Petitioner shall file an unredacted notice, as well as proof of service, forthwith.

'