Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 04:28:17 (UTC).

RYAN ALBERTS VS MAX PERLMUTTERS

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 RYAN ALBERTS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MAX PERLMUTTERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7640

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALBERTS RYAN

Defendant

PERLMUTTERS MAX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.

Defendant Attorney

MACKEY ROBERT T.

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/11/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/2/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/16/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

10/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/1/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2023
  • Hearing09/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Hearing04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Hearing03/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Max Perlmutters (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Max Perlmutters (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Max Perlmutters (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Ryan Alberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ryan Alberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ryan Alberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ryan Alberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ryan Alberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ryan Alberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACKEY ROBERT THOMAS