This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 09:12:39 (UTC).

RUZANNA KAZARYAN , ET AL VS WAL-MART STORES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 RUZANNA KAZARYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7434

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

KAZARYAN NUNE

AGADZHANYAN MARY

KAZARYAN RUZANNA

KAZARYAN VIKTORYA

KAZARYAN KRISTINA

KAZARYAN HERMINE

AMIRKHANYAN DANIEL DAVID

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TAYLOR FRESH FOODS INC. DBA TAYLOR FARMS

WAL-MART STORES INC. DBA SAM'S CLUB

SAM'S WEST INC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-25

Minors

AGAD-ZHANYAN HAIK MICHAEL

KAZARYAN HAKOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorneys

GABLER RONALD G. ESQ.

GABLER RONALD GERSON ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

D'ANGELO BRON

WEST EUGENE F.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/15/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

ANSWER-CONTRACT

2/21/2018: ANSWER-CONTRACT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/10/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order

11/16/2018: Order

Other -

11/21/2018: Other -

Request for Dismissal

2/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Cross-Complaint

12/29/2017: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/29/2017: Answer

Other -

12/29/2017: Other -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/2/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

10/2/2016: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER

10/24/2016: SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

10/2/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

10/10/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

10/10/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

SUMMONS

10/10/2017: SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; (Trial) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by RUZANNA KAZARYAN (Plaintiff); MARY AGADZHANYAN (Plaintiff); DANIEL DAVID AMIRKHANYAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by TAYLOR FRESH FOODS, INC. DBA TAYLOR FARMS (Defendant); SAM'S WEST INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Order (Los Angeles Model Stipulation and Protective Order Confidential Designation Only)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Other - (Demand for Expert Witness Designation); Filed by TAYLOR FRESH FOODS, INC. DBA TAYLOR FARMS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Order (Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC [And Related Motion/Discovery Dates])

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by RUZANNA KAZARYAN (Plaintiff); MARY AGADZHANYAN (Plaintiff); DANIEL DAVID AMIRKHANYAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Summons; Filed by RUZANNA KAZARYAN (Plaintiff); HAIK MICHAEL AGAD-ZHANYAN (Legacy Party); MARY AGADZHANYAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by RUZANNA KAZARYAN (Plaintiff); MARY AGADZHANYAN (Plaintiff); DANIEL DAVID AMIRKHANYAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.