This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2021 at 10:36:54 (UTC).

RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS UNION PACIFIC CORPORATION, A UTAH CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC CORPORATION, A UTAH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5000

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON RUSTY

Defendant

UNION PACIFIC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

11/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [JOINT] TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE; [PROPOSED]

11/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [JOINT] TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE; [PROPOSED]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

9/27/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/27/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/27/2021

9/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/27/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rusty Rendon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([Joint] to Extend Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline); Filed by Union Pacific Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 2:02 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Rusty Rendon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rusty Rendon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rusty Rendon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rusty Rendon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less