This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 10:54:06 (UTC).

RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS THE TILE SHOP, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE TILE SHOP, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7132

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON AN INDIVIDUAL RUSTY

Defendant

THE TILE SHOP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J

Defendant Attorney

CHILLEEN MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPIES

9/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPIES

Answer

8/27/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • Hearing03/17/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Case Management Conference and Mandatory Chambers Copies); Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Tile Shop, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TILE SHOP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILLEEN MICHAEL