This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2021 at 02:48:10 (UTC).

RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SEPHORA USA, INC., A MICHIGAN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SEPHORA USA, INC , A MICHIGAN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6309

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON AN INDIVIDUAL RUSTY

Defendant

SEPHORA USA INC. A MICHIGAN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEPHORA USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J