This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 05:10:39 (UTC).

RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS RUBY TUESDAY, INC., A GEORGIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RUBY TUESDAY, INC , A GEORGIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8752

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON AN INDIVIDUAL RUSTY

Defendant

RUBY TUESDAY INC. A GEORGIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J

Defendant Attorney

MILLER JONATHAN DENGLER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/29/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION) OF 12/04/2019

12/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION) OF 12/04/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

12/4/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

12/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

12/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 3:39 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Stipulation) of 12/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Stipulation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint; [Proposed] Order); Filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc., a Georgia corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUBY TUESDAY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J