This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 07:13:17 (UTC).

RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS HEALTH4HOME, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HEALTH4HOME, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6623

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON AN INDIVIDUAL RUSTY

Defendant

HEALTH4HOME LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

2/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/7/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less