Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 09:52:52 (UTC).

RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FTD, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 RUSTY RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FTD, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0038

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RENDON AN INDIVIDUAL RUSTY

RENDON RUSTY

Defendants

FTD LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FTD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/17/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rusty Rendon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rusty Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FTD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J