This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 11:22:04 (UTC).

RUIZ NACIONALES, EVANGELINE O. VS PACLEB, VIVENCIO MANGAONG

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 RUIZ NACIONALES, EVANGELINE O filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against PACLEB, VIVENCIO MANGAONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0450

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUIZ NACIONALES EVANGELINE O.

Respondent

PACLEB VIVENCIO MANGAONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

WOHN STEVEN ERIC

 

Court Documents

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/6/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partly Granted, Partly Denied

4/6/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partly Granted, Partly Denied

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/6/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

4/6/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proof of Service

4/17/2020: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Mail

4/23/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Civil Harassment

4/23/2020: Response - Civil Harassment

Minute Order

4/27/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/27/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • Hearing06/30/2020 at 1:30 PM in Department N at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder (Request to Consolidate Court Hearings on Related Cases and Order; Sent to Dept. N for review/signature on 05/14/2020 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Partly Granted, Partly Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.