This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2020 at 19:50:34 (UTC).

RUFINO ESPERON VS EXCELA CREATIVE, LLC, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 RUFINO ESPERON filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against EXCELA CREATIVE, LLC, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8329

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPERON RUFINO

Defendants

RANGER ASHLEY

EXCELA CREATIVE LLC

HUTCHISON DEXTER

RANGER ASHELY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRUGER JACKIE ROSE

Defendant Attorneys

BLANK ROME LLP

DONELAN CAROLINE POWELL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/2/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Settlement

2/19/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENSE COUNSEL, CAROLINE DONELAN/CAITLIN SANDERS'...)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENSE COUNSEL, CAROLINE DONELAN/CAITLIN SANDERS'...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

8/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR INF

2/11/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR INF

Answer

8/20/2019: Answer

Complaint

11/3/2017: Complaint

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

12/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

12/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Reply - To Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

8/14/2018: Reply - To Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00

8/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - Notice of unavailability of counsel The Kruger Law Firm from 12-19-18-1-2-19

12/17/2018: Notice - Notice of unavailability of counsel The Kruger Law Firm from 12-19-18-1-2-19

Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF CAITLIN I. SANDERS RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(a)(2)

2/1/2019: Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF CAITLIN I. SANDERS RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(a)(2)

Notice - Notice STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

2/8/2019: Notice - Notice STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Request - REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DUE TO COUNSEL MEDICAL EMERGENCY

5/14/2019: Request - REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DUE TO COUNSEL MEDICAL EMERGENCY

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

5/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/24/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJudgment (- Stipulated Judgment - Before Trial - 09/23/2020 entered for Plaintiff ESPERON, RUFINO; Plaintiff ESPERON, RUFINO against Defendant Dexter Hutchison; Defendant Ashley Ranger; Defendant Excela Creative, LLC.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment); Filed by RUFINO ESPERON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by RUFINO ESPERON (Plaintiff); RUFINO ESPERON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department P; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Stipulated by all Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ); Filed by Stipulated by all Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by RUFINO ESPERON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by RUFINO ESPERON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RUFINO ESPERON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC128329    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: P

 

Rufino Esperon v. Excela Creative, LLC et al. Case No. SC128329

Defense Counsel’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Hearing Date January 14, 2020 UNOPPOSED

TENTATIVE RULING

Caitlin Sanders, Esq. moves to be relieved as counsel for defendants Excela Creative, LLC, Dexter Hutchison, and Ashely Ranger. This motion is not opposed.

The notice of motion and motion, declaration, and proposed order are on the appropriate Judicial Council forms and addressed to the client. CRC, rule 3.1362(a), (c), (e). The declaration indicates defendants were served by mail, and counsel confirmed defendants’ address by email.

The “determination of whether to grant or deny a motion to withdraw as counsel lies within the sound discretion of the trial court.” Manfredi & Levine v. Superior Court (1998) 66 Cal.App.4th 1128, 1133-1134 (quoting Aceves v. Superior Court (1996) 51 Cal.App.4th 584, 592). Situations where courts deny a motion to withdraw as counsel generally involve a request by counsel that is too close to trial or situations where the attorney does not properly explain the basis for the request to withdraw. E.g. People v. Brown (1988) 203 Cal.App.3d 1335, 1341.

Jury trial is scheduled for March 2, 2020. It is unlikely defendants would be able to retain counsel before trial. Counsel argues the motion should be granted because “there has been an irreparable breakdown in the attorney-client relationship such that continued representation is not possible.” Given the possible prejudice to defendants, the court requires more specificity before the motion can be granted. The court does note defendants do not oppose the motion. Counsel will be given an opportunity to appear in camera outside the presence of the other parties to explain the facts establishing good cause for withdrawal.