This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 22:49:15 (UTC).

RUEY TSAI VS CHENG ZHEN

Case Summary

On 10/17/2017 RUEY TSAI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHENG ZHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9718

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

TSAI JUI KUNG

TSAI RUEY

TSAI HUI L.

ZHEN CHENG

Assignee

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOWER LESLIE ANNE ESQ

BOWER LESLIE A. ESQ

Defendant Attorney

FULLMAN ADAM CHRISTIAN

Assignee Attorney

BESNYL GLENN ALAN ESQ

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/17/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/17/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

10/17/2017: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/19/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown

12/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/8/2017: Unknown

Application

2/1/2018: Application

Unknown

2/1/2018: Unknown

Unknown

8/10/2018: Unknown

Answer

9/26/2018: Answer

Order

10/1/2018: Order

Temporary Protective Order

10/3/2018: Temporary Protective Order

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

10/3/2018: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Declaration

10/3/2018: Declaration

Notice

10/10/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/31/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

2/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Writ - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Ruey Tsai (Plaintiff); Hui L. Tsai (Plaintiff); Jui Kung Tsai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (notice of case reassignment); Filed by Ruey Tsai (Plaintiff); Hui L. Tsai (Plaintiff); Jui Kung Tsai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Order (Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Declaration (of Cheng Zhen in support of opposition); Filed by Cheng Zhen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-31 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by Ruey Tsai (Plaintiff); Hui L. Tsai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ruey Tsai (Plaintiff); Hui L. Tsai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Ruey Tsai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Ruey Tsai (Plaintiff); Hui L. Tsai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ruey Tsai (Plaintiff); Hui L. Tsai (Plaintiff); Jui Kung Tsai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less